Nubai Global Investment Limited v. Clarke
Plaintiff: Nubai Global Investment Limited
Defendant: Thomas Clarke
Case Number: 0:2018cv02228
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
2 Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting parties' #71 Stipulation on Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/28/2018. (AJS)
September 27, 2018 Filing 72 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #71 Stipulation. (Hamborg, Benjamin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 71 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Thomas Clarke. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff Nubai Global Investment Limited. (Hamborg, Benjamin)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #68 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Nubai shall file a public redacted version of Docket No. 7 that redacts bank account information, as discussed above, by September 28, 2018. Once Nubai has done so, the Court will review the document and will issue an order regarding the motion for continued sealing of the unredacted document in Docket No. 7. Sealing. Document Number(s) to be UNSEALED: 6, 8, 9, 10, 27, 28, 29, 30, 31. 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 37, 38 and 42. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 10/15/2018 unless further timely submissions are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/14/2018. (KMH)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER on #66 Stipulation : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Thomas Clarke shall answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before October 1, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/30/2018. (KMH)
August 29, 2018 Filing 68 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #34 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #28 Declaration in Opposition, #31 Exhibit, #27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #29 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited. (Johnson, Benjamin)
August 27, 2018 Filing 67 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #66 Stipulation. (Elsass, Douglas)
August 27, 2018 Filing 66 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by Nubai Global Investment Limited. Jointly Signed by Thomas Clarke. (Elsass, Douglas)
August 20, 2018 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 8/10/2018 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (51 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 9/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2018. (DKB)
August 20, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (DKB)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Memorandum re: #57 Order granting Nubai's Motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 8/17/2018. (KLL) Modified link and text on 8/21/2018 (MMG).
August 13, 2018 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Thomas Clarke for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #59 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Debra Beauvais. (Olsen, David)
August 13, 2018 Filing 61 RECEIPT number 44641099855 in the amount of $100,000.00 issued to Nilan Johnson Lewis PA. (MMP)
August 13, 2018 Filing 60 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Nubai Global Investment Limited for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #59 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Debra Beauvais. (Jackson, J)
August 10, 2018 Filing 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Motion Hearing held on 8/10/2018 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited. Written Order issued. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais) (CLG)
August 10, 2018 Filing 58 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(kt)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 8/10/2018. (CLG)
August 9, 2018 Filing 56 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #55 Unsealed Reply Memo AMENDED filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited.(Johnson, Benjamin)
August 9, 2018 Filing 55 REPLY re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Johnson, Benjamin)
August 9, 2018 Filing 54 EXHIBIT 5 Amended re #47 Declaration in Opposition filed by Thomas Clarke.(Olsen, David)
August 8, 2018 Filing 53 EXHIBIT 10 re #47 Declaration in Opposition filed by Thomas Clarke.(Williams, Stuart)
August 8, 2018 Filing 52 EXHIBIT 9 re #47 Declaration in Opposition filed by Thomas Clarke.(Williams, Stuart)
August 8, 2018 Filing 51 EXHIBIT 8 re #47 Declaration in Opposition filed by Thomas Clarke.(Williams, Stuart)
August 8, 2018 Filing 50 EXHIBIT 5 re #47 Declaration in Opposition filed by Thomas Clarke.(Williams, Stuart)
August 8, 2018 Filing 49 EXHIBIT 4 re #47 Declaration in Opposition filed by Thomas Clarke.(Williams, Stuart)
August 8, 2018 Filing 48 EXHIBIT 3 re #47 Declaration in Opposition filed by Thomas Clarke.(Williams, Stuart)
August 8, 2018 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Thomas Clarke in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Thomas Clarke.(Olsen, David)
August 8, 2018 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Nubai Global Investment Limited re #41 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court by Nubai Global Investment Limited . (Elsass, Douglas)
August 8, 2018 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Thomas Clarke. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olsen, David)
August 8, 2018 Filing 44 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #34 , #35 , #31 , #29 Exhibits 1, 2, 6 and 7 Amended filed by Thomas Clarke.(Olsen, David)
August 8, 2018 Filing 43 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #42 Sealed Reply Memorandum filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited.(Elsass, Douglas)
August 8, 2018 Filing 42 SEALED REPLY re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Elsass, Douglas)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 8/7/2018. (CLG)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alan Arkin for Thomas Clarke.; granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard Saydah, Jr for Thomas Clarke. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/7/2018. (JGK)
August 7, 2018 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas Clarke re #34 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #26 Statement instead of Redacted Document - Entire Document Confidential/Impracticable to Redact, #35 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #28 Declaration in Opposition, #31 Exhibit, #27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #29 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit on Plaintiff's counsel, Douglas L. Elsass, Nilan Johnson Lewis PA (Olsen, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 38 SEALED EXHIBIT 10 re #28 Declaration in Opposition filed by Defendant.(Olsen, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 37 SEALED EXHIBIT 9 re #28 Declaration in Opposition filed by Defendant.(Olsen, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 36 SEALED EXHIBIT 8 re #28 Declaration in Opposition filed by Defendant.(Olsen, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 35 SEALED EXHIBIT 7 re #28 Declaration in Opposition filed by Defendant.(Olsen, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 34 SEALED EXHIBIT 6 re #28 Declaration in Opposition filed by Defendant.(Olsen, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 33 SEALED EXHIBIT 5 re #28 Declaration in Opposition filed by Defendant.(Olsen, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 32 SEALED EXHIBIT 4 re #28 Declaration in Opposition filed by Defendant.(Olsen, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 31 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 re #28 Declaration in Opposition filed by Defendant.(Olsen, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 30 SEALED EXHIBIT 3 re #28 Declaration in Opposition filed by Defendant.(Olsen, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 29 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 re #28 Declaration in Opposition filed by Defendant.(Olsen, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 28 SEALED DECLARATION of Thomas M. Clarke in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Defendant.(Olsen, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 27 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olsen, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 26 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #27 , #28 , #29 , #30 , #31 , #32 , #33 , #34 , #35 , #36 , #37 Memorandum, Declaration and Exhibits filed by Thomas Clarke.(Olsen, David) Modified links and text on 8/9/2018 (MMG).
August 6, 2018 Filing 25 LETTER from Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (CLG) (cc: Burnes) Modified on 8/9/2018 (AKL).
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-2228 (PJS/DTS). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/6/2018. (MMP)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David E Potter for Nubai Global Investment Limited.; granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jaipat Singh Jain for Nubai Global Investment Limited. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/3/2018. (JGK)
August 3, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gilbert R. Saydah Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6278015 filed by Thomas Clarke. (Olsen, David)
August 3, 2018 Filing 21 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE received in chambers on 8/3/2018. (CLG)
August 3, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alan R. Arkin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6277938 filed by Thomas Clarke. (Olsen, David)
August 3, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by David Bradley Olsen on behalf of Thomas Clarke. (Olsen, David)
August 2, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jaipat S. Jain. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6270533 filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited. (Riskin, Sarah)
August 2, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David E. Potter. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6270485 filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited. (Riskin, Sarah)
August 1, 2018 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
July 31, 2018 Filing 15 (Text-Only) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. Defendant must file a response to the motion no later than 12:00 noon on 8/6/2018 and plaintiff may file a reply no later than 12:00 noon on 8/8/2018. Plaintiff is directed to immediately notify defendant and his counsel of the date and time of the motion hearing and the deadlines stated herein.(CLG)
July 31, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Thomas Clarke. (MMP)
July 31, 2018 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th, Stockholder Suits list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 18-cv-2228 (PJS/HB). (MMP)
July 31, 2018 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited.(Elsass, Douglas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 11 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #10 , #7 , #6 , #8 , #9 Exhibits 1, 2, 6, 7 and 8 filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited.(Elsass, Douglas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 10 SEALED EXHIBIT 8 re #5 Declaration in Support, filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited.(Elsass, Douglas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 9 SEALED EXHIBIT 7 re #5 Declaration in Support, filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited.(Elsass, Douglas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 8 SEALED EXHIBIT 6 re #5 Declaration in Support, filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited.(Elsass, Douglas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 re #5 Declaration in Support, filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited.(Elsass, Douglas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 re #5 Declaration in Support, filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited.(Elsass, Douglas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 Declaration of John Oram in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 3-5, #2 Exhibit(s) 9-14)(Elsass, Douglas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Elsass, Douglas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited. (Elsass, Douglas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Plaintiff Nubai Global Investment Limited is a wholly owned subsidiary of Lighthouse Bay Holdings Limited. (Elsass, Douglas) Modified on 7/31/2018 (AKL).
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Clarke (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6264398) filed by Nubai Global Investment Limited. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Elsass, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nubai Global Investment Limited v. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Clarke
Represented By: Stuart T Williams
Represented By: Alan Arkin
Represented By: Gilbert Richard Saydah, Jr
Represented By: David Bradley Olsen
Represented By: Benjamin J Hamborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nubai Global Investment Limited
Represented By: Douglas L Elsass
Represented By: Sarah B C Riskin
Represented By: Benjamin C. Johnson
Represented By: David E Potter
Represented By: Jaipat Singh Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?