Living Greens Farm, Inc. v. Hollandia Produce Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Living Greens Farm, Inc.
Defendant: Hollandia Produce Group, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv02229
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
2 Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Nancy E. Brasel, this case is reassigned to her. Judge Patrick J. Schiltz is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-02229-NEB-SER. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JAT)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Living Greens Farm, Inc.. Hollandia Produce Group, Inc. waiver sent on 8/8/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Kuhlmann, Nicholas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Jay R. Hamilton, Charles A. Damschen as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hollandia Produce Group, Inc.. (kt)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Copyright/Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18-cv-2229 PJS/SER. (kt)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6264502) filed by Living Greens Farm, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-S, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kuhlmann, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Living Greens Farm, Inc. v. Hollandia Produce Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Living Greens Farm, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas S Kuhlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollandia Produce Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?