Boitnott v. Wendy's International, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jerald Boitnott
Defendant: Nearco IV, LLC, Wendy's International, LLC d/b/a Wendy's and Wendy's International, LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv02247
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Cancelation of the Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2018 before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung per #14 ORDER. (EB)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this case are STAYED until October 31, 2018, or until the parties jointly request that the Stay be lifted, whichever is earlier. If the parties have not filed a stipulation for dismissal by October 31, 2018, the parties shall file a joint letter setting forth the status of this litigation no later than November 2, 2018. The pretrial scheduling conference set for September 28, 2018 (ECF No. 6) is STRICKEN. (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/19/2018. (EB)
September 13, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Motion to Stay. (Christensen, Corey)
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Settlement Discussions filed by all parties. (Christensen, Corey) Modified text on 9/17/2018 (kt).
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #9 Stipulation. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead in responseto Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 14, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/15/2018. (HAM)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Christensen, Corey)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Wendy's International, LLC. Jointly Signed by Jerald Boitnott. (Christensen, Corey)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Wendy's Restaurants, LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Wendy's International, LLC. (Christensen, Corey)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Corey Christensen on behalf of Wendy's International, LLC. (Christensen, Corey)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2018 at 01:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Nearco IV, LLC. (Viksnins, Ansis)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Nearco IV, LLC. (Viksnins, Ansis)
August 2, 2018 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (TJB)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Chad A. Throndset as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (AKL)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accomodations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 18cv2247 WMW/TNL. (AKL)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number Not yet received/Unknown at this time (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6266089) filed by Nearco IV, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal filed 7/31/2018) (Viksnins, Ansis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boitnott v. Wendy's International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nearco IV, LLC
Represented By: Ansis V Viksnins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy's International, LLC d/b/a Wendy's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy's International, LLC
Represented By: Corey Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald Boitnott
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?