United States of America v. $82,000.00 In U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $82,000.00 In U.S. Currency
Claimant: Paul Behr and Tara Rhoads
Case Number: 0:2018cv02298
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
2 Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Nancy E. Brasel, this case is reassigned to her. Judge Susan Richard Nelson is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-2298 NEB/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (LJG) cc: Tara Rhoads and Paul Behr on 9/20/2018 (KNK).
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2018 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM) cc: Tara Rhoads and Paul Behr on 9/20/2018 (KNK).
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION of of PUBLICATION by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Tweeten, Andrew)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Tara Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Paul Behr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 VERIFIED CLAIM filed by Paul Behr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd on 9/26/2018 (JGK).
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 VERIFIED CLAIM filed by Tara Rhoads. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd on 9/26/2018 (JGK).
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT Returned Executed (AKL)
August 7, 2018 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (kt)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 18-cv-2298 (SRN/TNL). (MMP)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $82,000.00 In U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tweeten, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $82,000.00 In U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $82,000.00 In U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Paul Behr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tara Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?