NCJC, Inc. et al v. Lawrence et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Goche and NCJC, Inc.
Defendant: Main Transport, LLC, Rick Lawrence and Randy Main
Case Number: 0:2018cv02309
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
2 Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Nancy E. Brasel, this case is reassigned to her. Judge Susan Richard Nelson is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-02309-NEB-BRT. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JAT)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCJC, Inc., Joseph Goche. Main Transport, LLC served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Hall, Daniel)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCJC, Inc., Joseph Goche. Randy Main served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Hall, Daniel)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCJC, Inc., Joseph Goche. Rick Lawrence served on 8/12/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(McElligott, Peter)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (MSK)
September 2, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Rick Lawrence, Randy Main, Main Transport, LLC. (Skaar, Randall)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rick Lawrence, Randy Main, Main Transport, LLC. (kt)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 18-cv-2309 SRN/BRT. (kt)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rick Lawrence, Randy Main, Main Transport, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6287529) filed by NCJC, Inc., Joseph Goche. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hall, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NCJC, Inc. et al v. Lawrence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Transport, LLC
Represented By: Randall T Skaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Lawrence
Represented By: Randall T Skaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Main
Represented By: Randall T Skaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Goche
Represented By: Daniel R Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NCJC, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?