Poitevent et al v. Dautel et al
Plaintiff: Paul J. Poitevent and Judith A. Poitevent
Defendant: Scott E. Michel, State of Minnesota, Alfred F. Michael, Jr., Cook County and the State of Minnesota in trust for the local taxing districts, Susan M. Fuller, United States of America, Kathie Comer Michel, Martha L. Dautel and also all heirs and devisees of any of the above-named persons who are deceased, and other persons or parties unknown, claiming any right, title, estate, lien or interest in the real property described
Case Number: 0:2018cv02320
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER from United States District Court, Clerk's Office to Cook County District Court re: Order of Remand. (MMP)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #9 Stipulation Between Plaintiffs Paul J. Poitevent and Judith A. Poitevent and Defendant United States of America for Remand to State Court. This case is hereby REMANDED to Cook County District Court, State of Minnesota. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 9/13/2018. (CBC) Modified text on 9/14/2018 (LEG).
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation,. (Champeaux, Roylene)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS PAUL J. POITEVENT AND JUDITH A. POITEVENT AND DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR REMAND TO STATE COURT by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Paul J. Poitevent and Judith A. Poitevent. (Champeaux, Roylene)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/10/2018. (VLM)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States of America.(Champeaux, Roylene)
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 Declaration of Roylene A. Champeaux in Support of #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States of America.(Champeaux, Roylene)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Champeaux, Roylene)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States of America. (Champeaux, Roylene)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 5th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18cv2320 JNE/LIB. (AKL)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cook County District Court, case number 16-CV-17-47 filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Petition, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Champeaux, Roylene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poitevent et al v. Dautel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott E. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred F. Michael, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County and the State of Minnesota in trust for the local taxing districts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Roylene A Champeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathie Comer Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha L. Dautel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: also all heirs and devisees of any of the above-named persons who are deceased, and other persons or parties unknown, claiming any right, title, estate, lien or interest in the real property described
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul J. Poitevent
Represented By: Jonathan W Leaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith A. Poitevent
Represented By: Jonathan W Leaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?