United States of America v. $52,521 in U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $52,521 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Horacio Iguanero-Martinez
Case Number: 0:2018cv02363
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
2 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/1/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 09:45 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (TMA)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem filed by Horacio Iguanero-Martinez. (Shiah, Thomas)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright, this case is reassigned to her. Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-2363 SRN/ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Please contact Theresa Anderson, at 651-848-1890, for scheduling or other matters related to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (kt)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(kt)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Horacio Iguanero-Martinez re #1 Complaint Verified Claim (Shiah, Thomas)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas H Shiah on behalf of Horacio Iguanero-Martinez. (Shiah, Thomas)
August 22, 2018 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (kt)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 18cv2363 SRN/DTS. (AKL)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $52,521 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baune, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $52,521 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $52,521 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Horacio Iguanero-Martinez
Represented By: Thomas H Shiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?