McCourt v. City of Waconia

Plaintiff: Noah J. McCourt
Defendant: City of Waconia
Case Number: 0:2018cv02377
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Carver
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Waconia, filed by Noah J. McCourt. No summons requested. (lmb)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/12/2018. (MSK) cc: Noah J. McCourt. Modified text on 9/14/2018 (MMP).
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Noah J. McCourt. (KNK) Document QC'd on 8/29/2018 (JGK).
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Waconia filed by Noah J. McCourt. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights Housing Accommodations & ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)cc: Noah J. McCourt. (KNK) Modified on 8/15/2018 (KNK). Modified on 8/15/2018 (KNK). Document QC'd on 8/29/2018 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCourt v. City of Waconia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Waconia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah J. McCourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?