Creighton v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Judith Lynn Creighton
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, L.L.C., Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Research & Development, LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv02402
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2018 8 Summons Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (MMP)
September 17, 2018 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, L.L.C., Johnson & Johnson. filed by Judith Lynn Creighton. Filer requests summons issued. (Burke, Daniel)
August 17, 2018 6 (Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Fluoroquinolone Products Liability Litigation, 0:15-md-2642 (JRT). Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-2642-JRT. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Fluoroquinolone MDL website at: #http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Fluoroquinolone/index.shtml. (lmb)
August 17, 2018 5 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 4/25/2016. (lmb)
August 17, 2018 4 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:18-cv-08547. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL List.
August 17, 2018 3 Featured Case Order of MDL Panel (CTO-133) transferring case to the USDC for the District of Minnesota. (dm ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2018.]
April 30, 2018 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jjc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2018.]
April 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8701056) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JUDITH LYNN CREIGHTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LEE, DAE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/17/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creighton v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Lynn Creighton
Represented By: Dae Y. Lee
Represented By: Daniel Christopher Burke, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?