Donlon v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Catherine Donlon
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 0:2018cv02411
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge: Steven E Rau
1 Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2018 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT that Life Insurance Company of North America is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Connecticut General Corporation, which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of CIGNA Holdings, Inc., which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of CIGNA Corporation. CIGNA Corporation is publicly traded. (Santos, Margaret) Modified on 10/15/2018 (kt).
October 12, 2018 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
September 19, 2018 9 CORRECTED TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Eric C. Tostrud, this case is reassigned to him. Judge Patrick J. Schiltz is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-2411 ECT/ESR. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt)
September 19, 2018 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Eric C. Tostrud, this case is reassigned to him. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-2411 ECT/SER. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt)
August 28, 2018 7 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 8/28/2018. (JGK)
August 28, 2018 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Santos, Margaret)
August 28, 2018 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6335870 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
August 28, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
August 20, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (AKL)
August 20, 2018 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18cv2411 PJS/SER. (AKL)
August 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6312932) filed by Catherine Donlon. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kramer, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donlon v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Kyle Alan Eidsness
Represented By: Margaret Ann Santos
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Donlon
Represented By: Patrick Ward Kramer
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?