Dalton v. Cedar Market Place, LLC

Plaintiff: Aaron Dalton
Defendant: Cedar Market Place, LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv02464
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 (Text-only) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: The Court has been notified that this matter has settled, therefore the Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez is CANCELED.(KAT)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Cedar Market Place, LLC re request for removal of pretrial conference from court calender. (Duffy, Matthew)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (BJP)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accomodations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 18cv2464 MJD/KMM. (AKL)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Cedar Market Place, LLC. (Duffy, Matthew)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Cedar Market Place, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) to Answer) (Duffy, Matthew)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota County, case number 19HA-CV-18-3745 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6328109) filed by Cedar Market Place, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) to Notice of Removal, #2 Summons and Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit(s) to Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Duffy, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalton v. Cedar Market Place, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Dalton
Represented By: Padraigin Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Market Place, LLC
Represented By: Matthew S Duffy
Represented By: Mae B Van Lengerich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?