Metro Metals Corporation v. C & C Manufacturing, LLC
Plaintiff: Metro Metals Corporation
Defendant: C & C Manufacturing, LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv02482
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
2 Judge: John R Tunheim
3 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/17/2018. (TMA)
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Metro Metals Corporation. Jointly Signed by C & C Manufacturing, LLC.(Smith, James)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Smith, James)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION For Protective Order by Metro Metals Corporation. Jointly Signed by C & C Manufacturing, LLC. (Smith, James)
October 8, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Smith on behalf of Metro Metals Corporation. (Smith, James)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/16/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 09:45 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (TMA)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sean P. Moore for C & C Manufacturing, LLC.; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James William White for C & C Manufacturing, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/25/2018. (JGK)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by C & C Manufacturing, LLC. (Schneider, Mark)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James W. White. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6392194 filed by C & C Manufacturing, LLC. (Schneider, Mark)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean P. Moore. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6392143 filed by C & C Manufacturing, LLC. (Schneider, Mark)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Eric C. Tostrud, this case is reassigned to him. Chief Judge John R. Tunheim is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18cv2482 ECT/ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JME)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright, this case is reassigned to her. Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-02482-JRT-ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Please contact Theresa Anderson, at 651-848-1890, for scheduling or other matters related to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (JAT)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to C & C Manufacturing, LLC. (kt)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18-cv-2482 JRT/SER. (kt)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C & C Manufacturing, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6329954) filed by Metro Metals Corporation. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Smith, James) Modified text on 8/24/2018 (kt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metro Metals Corporation v. C & C Manufacturing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metro Metals Corporation
Represented By: James T. Smith
Represented By: Craig D Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & C Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Sean P. Moore
Represented By: James William White
Represented By: Gary K Luloff
Represented By: Mark J Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?