Dorsey & Whitney LLP v. United States Postal Service

Plaintiff: Dorsey & Whitney LLP
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 0:2018cv02493
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
0 Judge: Becky R Thorson
1 Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/22/2018. (MSK)
October 17, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by United States Postal Service. Jointly Signed by Dorsey & Whitney LLP.(Tweeten, Andrew)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 (Text-only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing, TIME CHANGE ONLY: The Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2018 will begin at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (MSK)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by United States Postal Service. (Tweeten, Andrew)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (MSK)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorsey & Whitney LLP. United States Postal Service served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (Hontos, Alex)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Tweeten on behalf of United States Postal Service. (Tweeten, Andrew)
August 28, 2018 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (TJB)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service. (lmb)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 18-cv-2493 (WMW/BRT). (lmb)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Dorsey & Whitney LLP. (Hontos, Alex)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6333215) filed by Dorsey & Whitney LLP. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hontos, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsey & Whitney LLP v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorsey & Whitney LLP
Represented By: Alex P Hontos
Represented By: Caitlin L. D. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?