Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC v. Affordable Tires Plus, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC
Defendant: Affordable Tires Plus, Inc., R&M Prasch, Adassa Clement Opusunju and Josephine Gurley
Case Number: 0:2018cv02502
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Adina R Florea on behalf of R&M Prasch. (Florea, Adina)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on #14 Stipulation. Defendant R&M Prasch shall have to and including October 29, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/27/2018. (KAR)
September 26, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R&M Prasch (Bushnell, Sarah)
September 26, 2018 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation. (Bushnell, Sarah)
September 26, 2018 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant R&M Prasch. (Bushnell, Sarah)
September 26, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Enlargement of Time for Defendant R&M Prasch to Respond to the Complaint by R&M Prasch. Jointly Signed by Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Bushnell, Sarah)
September 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E Bushnell on behalf of R&M Prasch. (Bushnell, Sarah)
September 12, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC. Josephine Gurley served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Horrell, Holley)
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC. R&M Prasch served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Horrell, Holley)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kent T. Dallow for Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC.; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Hope Hamilton for Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/5/2018. (JGK)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hope Hamilton. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6350750 filed by Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC. (Horrell, Holley)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kent T. Dallow. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6350743 filed by Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC. (Horrell, Holley)
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC. Affordable Tires Plus, Inc. served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Horrell, Holley)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC. Adassa Clement Opusunju served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Horrell, Holley)
August 29, 2018 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Affordable Tires Plus, Inc., Josephine Gurley, Adassa Clement Opusunju, R&M Prasch. (lmb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 18-cv-2502 (DWF/DTS). (lmb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Hope Hamilton, Kent Dallow as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Bridgestone Americas, Inc. is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC. (Horrell, Holley)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Affordable Tires Plus, Inc., Josephine Gurley, Adassa Clement Opusunju, R&M Prasch (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6334549) filed by Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Horrell, Holley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC v. Affordable Tires Plus, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affordable Tires Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&M Prasch
Represented By: Sarah E Bushnell
Represented By: Adina R Florea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adassa Clement Opusunju
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine Gurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC
Represented By: Holley C Horrell
Represented By: Erin Sindberg Porter
Represented By: Kent T. Dallow
Represented By: Hope Hamilton
Represented By: David J. Wallace-Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?