Murray v. Cirrus Design Corporation
Plaintiff: Nancy Murray
Defendant: Cirrus Design Corporation
Case Number: 0:2018cv02510
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nancy Murray. Cirrus Design Corporation waiver sent on 9/11/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Wisner, Alexandra)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Nancy E. Brasel, this case is reassigned to her. Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-2510 NEB/LIB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Cirrus Design Corporation d/b/a Cirrus Aircraft on September 11, 2018 by Nancy Murray. Waiver of Service due by 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Wisner, Alexandra)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Nancy Murray. (Correia, Robert)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alexandra M Wisner for Nancy Murray. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/4/2018. (NMJ)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexandra M. Wisner. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6347452 filed by Nancy Murray. (Correia, Robert)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cirrus Design Corporation. (MMG)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 5th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18-cv-2510 PAM/LIB. (MMG)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cirrus Design Corporation (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6336263) filed by Nancy Murray. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Correia, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Cirrus Design Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Murray
Represented By: Robert A. Correia
Represented By: Alexandra M Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cirrus Design Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?