Carter et al v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Carter and Linda Carter
Defendant: City-County Federal Credit Union, Bank of America, N.A., Wings Financial Credit Union and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv02516
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 Joint and Separate ANSWER to Complaint filed by City-County Federal Credit Union, Wings Financial Credit Union. (Bachman, Lisa)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text-only) ORDER on #8 Stipulation: Defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall have an extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint until and including November 2, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 10/16/2018. (MME)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Schroeder, Mark)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Linda Carter and Kyle Carter. (Schroeder, Mark)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text-only) ORDER on #5 Stipulation. Defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall have an extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint until and including October 18, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 10/1/2018. (MME)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Schroeder, Mark)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Linda Carter and Kyle Carter. (Schroeder, Mark)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Linda Carter, Kyle Carter. Equifax Information Services LLC waiver sent on 8/28/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Chester, Anthony)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A., City-County Federal Credit Union, Equifax Information Services LLC, Wings Financial Credit Union. (lmb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18-cv-2516 (SRN/SER). (lmb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6337538) filed by Linda Carter, Kyle Carter. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chester, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter et al v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City-County Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Lisa Lamm Bachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Mark G Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wings Financial Credit Union
Represented By: Lisa Lamm Bachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Carter
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Carter
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?