Wilson v. GGNSC Rochester LLC et al
Plaintiff: Celia Wilson
Defendant: GGNSC Holdings LLC, GGNSC Administrative Services LLC and GGNSC Rochester LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv02524
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
2 Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachelle A Velgersdyk on behalf of All Defendants. (Velgersdyk, Rachelle)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (KAT)
September 20, 2018 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant GGNSC Rochester LLC. (Bassin, Alana)
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 GGNSC Rochester LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and for Jury Trial filed by GGNSC Rochester LLC. (Bassin, Alana)
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant GGNSC Holdings LLC. (Bassin, Alana)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 GGNSC Holdings LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and for Jury Trial filed by GGNSC Holdings LLC. (Bassin, Alana)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant GGNSC Administrative Services LLC. (Bassin, Alana)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 GGNSC Administrative Services LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and for Jury Trial filed by GGNSC Administrative Services LLC. (Bassin, Alana)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Nancy E. Brasel, this case is reassigned to her. Judge Patrick J. Schiltz is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-02524-NEB-KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JAT)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GGNSC Administrative Services LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, GGNSC Rochester LLC. (MMP)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 18-cv-2524 (PJS/KMM). (MMP)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Andrew D. Gross re #1 Complaint, byCelia Wilson. (Gross, Andrew)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, GGNSC Rochester LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6338840) filed by Celia Wilson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gross, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. GGNSC Rochester LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Holdings LLC
Represented By: Rachelle A Velgersdyk
Represented By: Alana K Bassin
Represented By: Jennifer L Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Administrative Services LLC
Represented By: Rachelle A Velgersdyk
Represented By: Alana K Bassin
Represented By: Jennifer L Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Rochester LLC
Represented By: Rachelle A Velgersdyk
Represented By: Alana K Bassin
Represented By: Jennifer L Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celia Wilson
Represented By: Andrew D Gross
Represented By: Mark R Kosieradzki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?