Basin Commerce, Inc. v. Celtic Marine Corporation
Plaintiff: Basin Commerce, Inc.
Defendant: Celtic Marine Corporation
Case Number: 0:2018cv02574
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 28 **TEXT ONLY ENTRY** NOTICE of Resetting of Motion Hearing: #19 #6 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue : Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2018 RESET for 11/8/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (JEP)
October 24, 2018 Filing 27 EXHIBIT D re #26 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Celtic Marine Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) D)(Reuter, Vince)
October 24, 2018 Filing 26 Reply to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Celtic Marine Corporation.(Reuter, Vince)
October 16, 2018 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Basin Commerce, Inc..(Cambronne, Karl)
October 16, 2018 Filing 24 EXHIBIT Index of Exhibits re #23 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Basin Commerce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) A1)(Cambronne, Karl)
October 16, 2018 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Basin Commerce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cambronne, Karl)
October 10, 2018 Filing 22 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (JEP)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/4/2018. (MSK)
September 28, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Basin Commerce, Inc.. Celtic Marine Corporation served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (Cambronne, Karl)
September 28, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue : Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Reuter, Vince)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robin Cassedy for Celtic Marine Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/28/2018. (JGK)
September 28, 2018 Filing 17 Declaration of Patricia Krebs in Support of #6 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Celtic Marine Corporation.(Reuter, Vince)
September 26, 2018 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Celtic Management Corporation is the parent corporation of Defendant Celtic Marine Corporation. (Reuter, Vince) Modified text on 9/27/2018 (MMG).
September 26, 2018 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Celtic Marine Corporation.(Reuter, Vince)
September 26, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Celtic Marine Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate.)(Reuter, Vince)
September 26, 2018 Filing 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Celtic Marine Corporation.(Reuter, Vince)
September 26, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, : Date and time to be determined. (Reuter, Vince)
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Celtic Marine Corporation. (Reuter, Vince)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Celtic Marine Corporation.(Reuter, Vince)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #6 Motion to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Celtic Marine Corporation.(Reuter, Vince)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Celtic Marine Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate., #2 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Reuter, Vince)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue : Date and time to be determined. (Reuter, Vince)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Celtic Marine Corporation. (Reuter, Vince)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robin D. Cassedy. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6397030 filed by Celtic Marine Corporation. (Reuter, Vince)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURES Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Basin Commerce, Inc..(Toder, Brian)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celtic Marine Corporation. (MMP)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 18-cv-2574 (PAM/BRT). (MMP)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celtic Marine Corporation (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6347661) filed by Basin Commerce, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cambronne, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basin Commerce, Inc. v. Celtic Marine Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celtic Marine Corporation
Represented By: Daniel J Cragg
Represented By: Vince C Reuter
Represented By: Robin Cassedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basin Commerce, Inc.
Represented By: Brian N Toder
Represented By: Wynn Curtiss
Represented By: Karl L Cambronne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?