Emmert v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Curtis K. Emmert
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 0:2018cv02577
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Moss on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Moss, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill. (kt)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/7/2018. (JMK)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (KNK)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer per Social Security List. Please use case number 18-cv-2577 (HB). (KNK)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Curtis K. Emmert. (Drummond, Steven)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill filed by Curtis K. Emmert. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Drummond, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emmert v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Michael Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis K. Emmert
Represented By: Steven J Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?