Patt et al v. H & S Contracting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bruce Carlson, The Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund, Michael Crabtree, Bill Patt, Corey Bergerson, The Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program, The Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, Alan Henke, Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program, the, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, the and Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund, the
Defendant: H & S Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv02592
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Donovan W Frank
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to H & S Contracting, Inc. (MMP)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corey Bergerson, Bruce Carlson, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, the, Michael Crabtree, Alan Henke, Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program, the, Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund, the, Bill Patt re #6 Application for Entry of Default, #7 Declaration, (Court, Amy)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Amy L. Court re #6 Application for Entry of Default by Corey Bergerson, Bruce Carlson, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, the, Michael Crabtree, Alan Henke, Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program, the, Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund, the, Bill Patt . (Court, Amy)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT . (Court, Amy)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund, the, Michael Crabtree, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, the, Corey Bergerson, Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program, the, Alan Henke, Bill Patt, Bruce Carlson. H & S Contracting, Inc. served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (Court, Amy)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - This matter is venued in the Sixth Division. All proceedings before the undersigned (motions, trial, etc.) will be held in the United States Courthouse in Fergus Falls, Minnesota, unless otherwise requested by the parties or directed by the Court. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 9/7/2018. (las)
September 7, 2018 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to H & S Contracting, Inc. (lmb)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (6th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18-cv-2592 (DWF/LIB). (lmb)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against H & S Contracting, Inc. (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6351347) filed by Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund, the, Michael Crabtree, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, the, Corey Bergerson, Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program, the, Alan Henke, Bill Patt, Bruce Carlson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court, Amy) Modified text on 9/6/2018 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patt et al v. H & S Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Crabtree
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Patt
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Bergerson
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Henke
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program, the
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, the
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund, the
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & S Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?