U.S. Bank National Association v. TD Bank National Association

Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: TD Bank National Association
Case Number: 0:2018cv02630
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Minnesota District Court
0 Judge: Leo I Brisbois
1 Judge: Joan N Ericksen
2 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2018 NOTICE: The case has been transferred/extracted to the District Court of New Jersey. (MMP)
October 23, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER on Joint #12 Stipulation to Transfer Venue. This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. The Clerk of Court is directed to effect the transfer. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 10/23/2018. (CBC)
October 22, 2018 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Kaplan, Philip)
October 22, 2018 12 STIPULATION to Transfer Venue by TD Bank National Association. Jointly Signed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Kaplan, Philip)
October 15, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER on #9 Stipulation - Defendant has until 10/23/2018 to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/15/2018. (VLM)
October 15, 2018 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Kaplan, Philip)
October 15, 2018 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, SECOND by TD Bank National Association. Jointly Signed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Kaplan, Philip)
October 9, 2018 8 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright, this case is reassigned to her. Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-2630 (JNE/ECW). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Please contact Theresa Anderson, at 651-848-1890, for scheduling or other matters related to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (lmb)
October 2, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER on #5 Stipulation - Defendant may move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 10/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/2/2018. (VLM)
October 2, 2018 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Kaplan, Philip)
September 28, 2018 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, by TD Bank National Association. Jointly Signed by US Bank National Association. (Kaplan, Philip)
September 19, 2018 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by U.S. Bank National Association re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Hofman, Kevin)
September 10, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to TD Bank National Association. (lmb)
September 10, 2018 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18-cv-2630 (JNE/LIB). (lmb)
September 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against TD Bank, National Association (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6358070) filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hofman, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. TD Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank National Association
Represented By: Philip J Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Kevin D Hofman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?