First National Repossessors, Inc. et al v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Plaintiff: First National Repossessors, Inc. and Don Mashak
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Case Number: 0:2018cv02635
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT of Communications with the Pro Se Project by Don Mashak. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(AKL) Document QC'd/Modified text on 11/5/2018 (ACH).
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 CONTINGENCY RESPONSE by Don Mashak re #5 Order on Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(AKL) Document QC'd/Modified text on 11/5/2018 (ACH).
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Rau. (MME) cc: Don Mashak. Modified on 10/18/2018 (lmb).
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time: Plaintiffs' request for an extension is GRANTED. Plaintiffs have 30 days from the date of this order to comply with the Court's Order filed on 9/27/2018 [Doc. No. #5 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 10/18/2018. (MME) cc: Don Mashak. Modified on 10/18/2018 (lmb).
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Don Mashak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKL)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 9/27/2018. (MME) cc: Plaintiffs. Modified on 9/28/2018 (lmb).
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by First National Repossessors, Inc., Don Mashak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKL) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/10/18 (KMH)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. ORDER denying #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 9/20/2018. (MME)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, with attachment, filed by First National Repossessors, Inc., Don Mashak. (lmb) Modified on 9/25/2018 (kt). Document QC'd by KMH on 10/17/2018 (KMH)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Internal Revenue filed by First National Repossessors, Inc., Don Mashak. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Federal Tax Suits) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-9, #2 Exhibit(s) Copy of Dept of Treasury Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Certificate of Service). (lmb) cc: Plaintiff. Document QC'd by KMH on 10/17/2018 (KMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First National Repossessors, Inc. et al v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First National Repossessors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Mashak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?