Wedington v. Office of Inspector General et al
Plaintiff: Calvin S. Wedington
Defendant: SOS Hansen, FMC Rochester et. al., Office of Internal Affairs, FBOP: Jailor-Superintentant and Office of Inspector General
Case Number: 0:2018cv02694
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #4 Order on Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 11/9/2018. (MME) cc: Wedington on 11/14/2018 (KNK).
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Calvin S. Wedington re #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 11/6/2018.
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Calvin S. Wedington. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 11/6/2018.
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Jurisdiction and Venue to Chambers of Senior Judge William R. Collison and Extension of Time of 10 days filed by Calvin S. Wedington. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 11/6/2018.
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 10/9/2018. (MME) . cc: Wedington on 10/11/2018 (KNK).
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Calvin S. Wedington. (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/19/18 (KMH).
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Calvin S. Wedington. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/19/18 (KMH).
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against FBOP: Jailor-Superintentant, FMC Rochester et. al., Hansen, Office of Inspector General, Office of Internal Affairs filed by Calvin S. Wedington. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd, 4th, Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) cc: Wedington (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/19/18 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wedington v. Office of Inspector General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOS Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Rochester et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Internal Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBOP: Jailor-Superintentant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Inspector General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin S. Wedington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?