McCourt v. Norwood Young America, City of

Plaintiff: Noah John McCourt
Defendant: Norwood Young America, City of
Case Number: 0:2018cv02743
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Padraigin Browne on behalf of Noah John McCourt. (Browne, Padraigin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (JEP) cc: Noah John McCourt. Modified text on 10/11/2018 (MMP).
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER from United States District Court, Clerk's Office to Noah John McCourt re: Marshal Service Form. (MMP) cc: McCourt. Modified text on 10/11/2018 (MMP).
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/11/2018. (MSK) cc: McCourt with USM Form. Modified text on 10/11/2018 (MMP).
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Noah John McCourt. (AKL) Document QC'd on 10/10/2018 (CLK).
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norwood Young America, City of filed by Noah John McCourt. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accomodations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (cc: McCourt) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (AKL) Document QC'd on 10/10/2018 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCourt v. Norwood Young America, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norwood Young America, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah John McCourt
Represented By: Padraigin Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?