Rodriguez Carrillo v. Sessions et al
Petitioner: Juan Carlos Rodriguez Carrillo
Respondent: Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Scott Baniecke and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 0:2018cv02897
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 11/7/2018. (KMW)
November 7, 2018 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Brooker, Gregory)
November 7, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Scott Baniecke, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D. Vitiello. Jointly Signed by Juan Carlos Rodriguez Carrillo. (Brooker, Gregory)
October 22, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION by Scott Baniecke, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D. Vitiello. Jointly Signed by Juan Carlos Rodriguez Carrillo. (Brooker, Gregory)
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy E. Brasel: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/15/2018. Parties are still working to resolve the case. A status update shall be provided to the Court on or before 10/24/18. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW)
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION by Scott Baniecke, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D. Vitiello. Jointly Signed by Juan Carlos Rodriguez Carrillo. (Tweeten, Andrew)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 (Text-only) NOTICE of Setting Telephonic Hearing. A Status Conference is scheduled for 10/15/2018 at 11:00 AM. Parties requested a telephonic hearing. Instructions for dialing into the Court's Conference Bridge have been sent to the parties. In a conference call on 10/10/18 the parties indicated the TRO hearing was no longer needed and the motion would be withdrawn. A stipulation would be filed in the near future regarding the temporary holding of the defendant in the United States and the parties working on good-faith negotiations to resolve the matter. (KMW)
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory G Brooker on behalf of Scott Baniecke, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D. Vitiello. (Brooker, Gregory)
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Tweeten on behalf of Scott Baniecke, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D. Vitiello. (Tweeten, Andrew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Scott Baniecke, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D. Vitiello. (KNK)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 EXHIBIT 1 Declaration and Exhibit A re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Juan Carlos Rodriguez Carrillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Bakken, Brittany) Modified text on 10/19/2018 (lmb).
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Calleigh McRaith on behalf of Juan Carlos Rodriguez Carrillo. (McRaith, Calleigh)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Juan Carlos Rodriguez Carrillo.(Bakken, Brittany)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, REISSUED - Summons Issued as to Scott Baniecke, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D. Vitiello. (KNK) Modified on 10/10/2018 (KNK).
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Juan Carlos Rodriguez Carrillo. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bakken, Brittany)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 18-cv-2897 (NEB/ECW). (KNK)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Wilson on behalf of Juan Carlos Rodriguez Carrillo. (Wilson, David)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $ 5, receipt number AMNDC-6419653) filed by Juan Carlos Rodriguez Carrillo. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fiddler, Grace)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez Carrillo v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Baniecke
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Carlos Rodriguez Carrillo
Represented By: Brittany S Bakken
Represented By: David L Wilson
Represented By: Calleigh McRaith
Represented By: Grace Elizabeth Fiddler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?