Elsherif v. Mayo Clinic et al
Plaintiff: Mohamed Elsherif
Defendant: Robert J. Spinner and Mayo Clinic
Case Number: 0:2018cv02998
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss Count X #12 Meet and Confer Statement, #9 Motion to Dismiss/General, #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #13 Declaration in Support, #10 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wood, George)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 Declaration of Carrie P. Campbell in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mayo Clinic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-7)(Wood, George)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #9 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Mayo Clinic.(Wood, George)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mayo Clinic. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wood, George)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Wood, George)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mayo Clinic. (Wood, George)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Mayo Clinic, Robert J. Spinner. (Wood, George)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Mayo Clinic, Robert J. Spinner. (Wood, George)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mohamed Elsherif re #5 Amended Complaint (Rimas, Vytas)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mayo Clinic, Robert J. Spinner. filed by Mohamed Elsherif. No summons requested. (Rimas, Vytas)
November 28, 2018 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert J. Spinner, Mayo Clinic. Robert J. Spinner waiver sent on 10/24/2018, answer due 12/24/2018; Mayo Clinic waiver sent on 10/24/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mayo Clinic, Robert J. Spinner. (MMP)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd, 4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 18-cv-2998 (DWF/KMM). (MMP)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mayo Clinic, Robert J. Spinner (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6451891) filed by Mohamed Elsherif. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rimas, Vytas) Modified text on 10/23/2018 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elsherif v. Mayo Clinic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Spinner
Represented By: George R Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo Clinic
Represented By: George R Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Elsherif
Represented By: Vytas M Rimas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?