Rodriguez v. PJ Hafiz Club Management Inc.
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Rodriguez
Defendant: PJ Hafiz Club Management Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv03037
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/24/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 10:45 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (TMA) cc: Jacqueline Rodriguez. Modified text on 12/27/2018 (JLB).
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by PJ Hafiz Club Management Inc. re #8 Answer to Complaint, #7 Notice of Appearance (Lund, Colby)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by PJ Hafiz Club Management Inc.. (Lund, Colby)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Colby B Lund on behalf of PJ Hafiz Club Management Inc.. (Lund, Colby)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jacqueline Rodriguez. PJ Hafiz Club Management Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (KNK) Modified on 12/6/2018 (KNK). Document QC'd by KMH on 12/20/2018 (KMH).
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service for Defendant PJ Hafiz Club Management Inc.. Documents have been mailed to all listed defendants: Order Granting IFP, Complaint, two Waiver of Services (AO 399), and one Prepaid Envelope. Waiver of Service due by 12/21/2018. (kt)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Jacqueline Rodriguez enclosing Order #3 and One (1) USM-285 form. (lmb) cc: Jacqueline Rodriguez.
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/2/2018. (TMA) cc: Jacqueline Rodriguez. Modified on 11/7/2018 (lmb).
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jacqueline Rodriguez. (AKL) Document QC'd by KMH on 11/6/2018.
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PJ Hafiz Club Management Inc. filed by Jacqueline Rodriguez. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(cc: Rodriguez) (AKL) Document QC'd by KMH on 11/6/2018.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. PJ Hafiz Club Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PJ Hafiz Club Management Inc.
Represented By: Colby B Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?