U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission v. Hengen
Plaintiff: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Mr. James E. Hengen and James E. Hengen
Case Number: 0:2018cv03135
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission re #6 First MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment , #8 Meet and Confer Statement, #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Frisof, David)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #6 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission.(Frisof, David)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 First MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Frisof, David)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 First MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Frisof, David)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 DOCUMENTS FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE AS SEPARATE EVENTS. First MOTION for Entry of Judgment filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Meet-and-Confer Statement, #3 Certificate of Service)(Frisof, David) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (JLB).
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Plaintiff filed a proposed final judgment against Defendant on November 8, 2018. Absent a formal motion, the Court will take no action on this filing. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 11/19/2018. (KLL)
November 15, 2018 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (KLL)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Antitrust/Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 18-cv-3135 WMW/DTS. (kt)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission Consent of Defendant James E. Hengen (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Judgment)(Frisof, David)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James E. Hengen filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Frisof, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission v. Hengen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. James E. Hengen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Hengen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: David T. Frisof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?