Itasca Images, LLC v. Zacks Investment Research, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Itasca Images, LLC
Defendant: Oath Inc. and Zacks Investment Research, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv03178
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John L Ambrogi for Oath Inc. and for Zacks Investment Research, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/11/2019. (NAH)
January 10, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John L. Ambrogi. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6599698 filed by Oath Inc., Zacks Investment Research, Inc.. (Kostolnik, Matthew)
January 9, 2019 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Oath Inc..(Kostolnik, Matthew)
January 9, 2019 Filing 29 Declaration of Laya R. Kaigh in Support of #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Oath Inc..(Kostolnik, Matthew)
January 9, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Oath Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kostolnik, Matthew)
January 9, 2019 Filing 27 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #25 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Oath Inc..(Kostolnik, Matthew)
January 9, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Kostolnik, Matthew)
January 9, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Oath Inc.. (Kostolnik, Matthew)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Oath Inc. answer due 1/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/26/2018. (TJB)
December 21, 2018 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Zacks Investment Research, Inc..(Kostolnik, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 22 Declaration of Don Ralph in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Zacks Investment Research, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Kostolnik, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Zacks Investment Research, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kostolnik, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 20 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #18 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Zacks Investment Research, Inc..(Kostolnik, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Kostolnik, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Zacks Investment Research, Inc.. (Kostolnik, Matthew)
December 11, 2018 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Unopposed filed by Oath Inc..(Kostolnik, Matthew)
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Unopposed filed by Oath Inc.. (Kostolnik, Matthew)
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Bondi on behalf of Oath Inc.. (Bondi, Michael)
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P Kostolnik on behalf of Oath Inc.. (Kostolnik, Matthew)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Zacks Investment Research, Inc.. (Kostolnik, Matthew)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Zacks Investment Research, Inc. answer due 12/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/5/2018. (TJB)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Itasca Images, LLC re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, upon Zacks Investment Research, Inc. (Flaherty, Scott)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Itasca Images, LLC re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, upon Oath, Inc. (Flaherty, Scott)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by Zacks Investment Research, Inc..(Kostolnik, Matthew)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by Zacks Investment Research, Inc.. (Kostolnik, Matthew)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Bondi on behalf of Zacks Investment Research, Inc.. (Bondi, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Itasca Images, LLC. (Flaherty, Scott)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P Kostolnik on behalf of Zacks Investment Research, Inc.. (Kostolnik, Matthew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint filed by Itasca Images, LLC. (Flaherty, Scott) Modified on 11/19/2018 (kt).
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Oath Inc., Zacks Investment Research, Inc. (MMP)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd 4th Copyright & Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 18-cv-3178 (PJS/DTS). (MMP)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oath Inc., Zacks Investment Research, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6493104) filed by Itasca Images, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N, #15 Exhibit(s) O, #16 Exhibit(s) P, #17 Exhibit(s) Q, #18 Exhibit(s) R, #19 Exhibit(s) S, #20 Exhibit(s) T, #21 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flaherty, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Itasca Images, LLC v. Zacks Investment Research, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oath Inc.
Represented By: Michael A Bondi
Represented By: John L Ambrogi
Represented By: Matthew P Kostolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zacks Investment Research, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A Bondi
Represented By: John L Ambrogi
Represented By: Matthew P Kostolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Itasca Images, LLC
Represented By: Scott M Flaherty
Represented By: O. Joseph Balthazor, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?