Malark v. RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Plaintiff: Maria Malark
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv03179
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2019 at 01:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Brown, Trevor)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Malark. RBC Capital Markets, LLC served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Kaster, James)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on #4 Stipulation. The deadline for RBC's Answeris extended to December 21, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/7/2018. (HAM)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Stipulation. (Brown, Trevor)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by RBC Capital Markets, LLC. Jointly Signed by Maria Malark. (Brown, Trevor)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (kt)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 18-cv-3179 ECT/TNL. (kt)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RBC Capital Markets, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6493166) filed by Maria Malark. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kaster, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malark v. RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Trevor C. Brown
Represented By: Melissa Raphan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Malark
Represented By: Michelle L Kornblit
Represented By: James H Kaster
Represented By: Laura Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?