Sohmer et al v. UnitedHealth Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kathy L. Fellgren and Samantha Sohmer
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company and OptumRX, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv03191
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J Wells on behalf of All Defendants. (Wells, Steven)
December 17, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. DesLauriers on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc.. (DesLauriers, Meghan)
November 15, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Chanele Reyes with Certificate of Service. (Obrist, Gretchen) Modified text on 11/19/2019 (ACH).
October 17, 2019 Filing 87 REPLY to Counterclaim [PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANTS' AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM] filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Izard, Robert)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER/NOTICE: AMENDED ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 1/17/2020. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 1/13/2020. Settlement Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/8/2019. (MSK)
October 2, 2019 Filing 85 ANSWER to Complaint , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. filed by Optum, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company. (Grant, Michelle)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/30/2019. (MSK)
September 30, 2019 Filing 83 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #82 Stipulation,. (Grant, Michelle)
September 30, 2019 Filing 82 STIPULATION to Amend First Amended Answer and Counterclaim by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc.. Jointly Signed by UnitedHealth Group Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Samantha Sohmer, and Kathy L. Fellgren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Grant, Michelle)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/29/2019. (MSK)
August 27, 2019 Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/27/2019. (MSK) Modified file date and text on 8/29/2019 (MMG).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #77 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ron Kilgard for Kathy L. Fellgren and for Samantha Sohmer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/21/2019. (NAH)
August 20, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Garrett Heilman (Obrist, Gretchen)
August 19, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ron Kilgard. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7089329 filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Williams, Amanda)
June 14, 2019 Filing 76 REPLY to Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendants' Counterclaim filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Jasinski, Mathew)
May 29, 2019 Filing 75 Amended Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Status Conference held on 5/28/2019. (MSK)
May 28, 2019 Filing 74 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Status Conference held on 5/28/2019. (MSK)
May 24, 2019 Filing 73 Amended ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. filed by Optum, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company. (Grant, Michelle)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER/NOTICE: ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 11/12/2019. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 11/1/2019. Settlement Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/13/2019. (MSK)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER/NOTICE: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2019. Fact Discovery due by 4/13/2020. Expert Discovery due by 9/17/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 4/29/2020. Motions (disp) due by 12/17/2020. Ready for trial due by 4/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/13/2019. (MSK)
May 3, 2019 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc.. (Grant, Michelle)
April 24, 2019 Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/24/2019. (MSK)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: The Court denies as moot Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss [Docket No. #32 ]. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 4/10/2019. (CBC)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 36, 38, 40, 42. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 5/9/2019 unless further timely submissions are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 4/10/2019. (MSK)
April 10, 2019 Filing 66 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #40 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc.. (Hull, Caitlin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin L. D. Hull on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc.. (Hull, Caitlin)
April 9, 2019 Filing 64 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Stipulation for Partial Dismissal of Claims. (Jasinski, Mathew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 63 STIPULATION for Partial Dismissal of Claims by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. Jointly Signed by UnitedHealth Group Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance, Optum, Inc., and OptumRx, Inc.. (Jasinski, Mathew)
April 2, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J Holly on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc.. (Holly, Andrew)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #57 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Chanele Reyes for Kathy L. Fellgren and for Samantha Sohmer. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 4/2/2019. (NAH)
March 29, 2019 Filing 60 (Text-only) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing re Defendants' #32 Motion to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen is CANCELLED. (CBC)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND HARD COPY DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/22/2019. (MSK)
March 21, 2019 Filing 58 REPLY re #32 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Grant, Michelle)
March 20, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chanele N. Reyes. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6750010 filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Williams, Amanda)
March 18, 2019 Filing 56 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #55 Stipulation,. (Jasinski, Mathew)
March 18, 2019 Filing 55 STIPULATION Regarding Production of Electronically Stored Information and Hard Copy Documents by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. Jointly Signed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, Optum, Inc., and OptumRx, Inc.. (Jasinski, Mathew)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/7/2019. (MSK)
March 7, 2019 Filing 53 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #52 Stipulation,. (Jasinski, Mathew)
March 7, 2019 Filing 52 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. Jointly Signed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Samantha Sohmer, and Kathy L. Fellgren. (Jasinski, Mathew)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2019 at 11:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. The parties should connect and jointly call in to Chambers for the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
March 1, 2019 Filing 50 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. Jointly Signed by Samantha Sohmer, Kathy L. Fellgren, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, Optum, Inc., and OptumRx, Inc..(Jasinski, Mathew)
February 28, 2019 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jasinski, Mathew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Status Conference held on 2/21/2019. (KLL)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #46 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Craig Archer Raabe for Kathy L. Fellgren and for Samantha Sohmer. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/24/2019. (NAH)
January 23, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Craig A. Raabe. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6624048 filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Williams, Amanda)
January 22, 2019 Filing 45 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #32 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc..(Grant, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 44 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #32 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc..(Grant, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 43 Redacted Document for #42 Sealed Exhibit 8 filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc..(Grant, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 42 SEALED EXHIBIT 8 re #35 Declaration in Support, filed by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC..(Grant, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 41 Redacted Document for #40 Sealed Exhibit 7 filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc..(Grant, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 40 SEALED EXHIBIT 7 re #35 Declaration in Support, filed by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC..(Grant, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 39 Redacted Document for #38 Sealed Exhibit 6 filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc..(Grant, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 38 SEALED EXHIBIT 6 re #35 Declaration in Support, filed by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC..(Grant, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 37 Redacted Document for #36 Sealed Exhibit 5 filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc..(Grant, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 36 SEALED EXHIBIT 5 re #35 Declaration in Support, filed by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC..(Grant, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 35 Declaration of Michelle S. Grant in Support of #32 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-4)(Grant, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support re #32 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Grant, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #32 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Grant, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc.. (Grant, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (Text-only) ORDER on #29 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Court is in receipt of the parties' Stipulation. The Stipulation is approved. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss due by 1/22/2019. Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Dismiss 2/28/2019. Defendants' Reply due by 3/21/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. Ordered by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/22/2019. (CBC)
January 18, 2019 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #29 Stipulation,. (Grant, Michelle)
January 18, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc.. Jointly Signed by Samantha Sohmer, Kathy L. Fellgren, UnitedHealth Group, Inc, United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, Optum, Inc., and OptumRx, Inc. (Grant, Michelle)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENTRY FILED IN ERROR-FILED INTO INCORRECT CASE. ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 18-cv-3191 (SRN/KMM) has been reassigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen and Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 12/7/2018 and Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/10/2018. (lmb) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (lmb).
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen and Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-3191 (JNE/BRT). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 12/7/2018 and Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/10/2018. (lmb)
December 5, 2018 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. United HealthCare Services, Inc. is a direct, 100%-owned subsidiary of UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. United Healthcare Insurance Company is a direct, 100%-owned subsidiary of UHIC Holdings, Inc. Optum, Inc. is a direct, 100%-owned subsidiary of United HealthCare Services, Inc. OptumRx, Inc. is a direct, 100%-owned subsidiary of OptumRx Holdings, LLC. (Grant, Michelle) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (MMG).
December 4, 2018 Filing 25 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc. . (Grant, Michelle)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Garrett Heilman for Kathy L. Fellgren and Samantha Sohmer; granting #21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert A. Izard, Jr for Kathy L. Fellgren and Samantha Sohmer; granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher Michael Barrett for Kathy L. Fellgren and Samantha Sohmer. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/28/2018. (AKL)
November 27, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C Gudmundson on behalf of Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Gudmundson, Brian)
November 26, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher M. Barrett. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6513875 filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Williams, Amanda)
November 26, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert A. Izard. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6513865 filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Williams, Amanda)
November 26, 2018 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Samantha Sohmer, Kathy L. Fellgren. United HealthCare Services, Inc. waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Williams, Amanda)
November 26, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Samantha Sohmer, Kathy L. Fellgren. United HealthCare Insurance Company waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Williams, Amanda)
November 26, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Samantha Sohmer, Kathy L. Fellgren. OptumRX, Inc. waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Williams, Amanda)
November 26, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Samantha Sohmer, Kathy L. Fellgren. Optum, Inc. waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Williams, Amanda)
November 26, 2018 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Samantha Sohmer, Kathy L. Fellgren. UnitedHealth Group Inc. waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Williams, Amanda)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gretchen S Obrist for Kathy L. Fellgren and Samantha Sohmer; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew Michael Gerend for Kathy L. Fellgren and Samantha Sohmer. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/26/2018. (AKL)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph P Guglielmo for Kathy L. Fellgren and Samantha Sohmer; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Carey Alexander for Kathy L. Fellgren and Samantha Sohmer; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Erin Green Comite for Kathy L. Fellgren and Samantha Sohmer. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/26/2018. (AKL)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Gerend. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6512241 filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Williams, Amanda)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Garrett Heilman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6512227 filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Williams, Amanda)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gretchen S. Obrist. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6512208 filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Williams, Amanda)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erin Green Comite. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6510142 filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Gustafson, Daniel)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Carey Alexander. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6510126 filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Gustafson, Daniel)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph P. Guglielmo. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6510111 filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Gustafson, Daniel)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mathew P. Jasinski for Kathy L. Fellgren and for Samantha Sohmer.; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William Henry Narwold for Kathy L. Fellgren for Samantha Sohmer. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/21/2018. (JGK)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William H. Narwold. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6507855 filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Gustafson, Daniel)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mathew P. Jasinski. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6507850 filed by Kathy L. Fellgren, Samantha Sohmer. (Gustafson, Daniel)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Insurance Company, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc.. (AKL)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Robert A. Izard; Craig A. Raabe; Christopher M. Barrett; William H. Narwold; Mathew Jasinski; Derek W. Loeser; Gretchen S. Obrist; Matthew Gerend; Garrett Heilman; Joseph P. Guglielmo; Carey Alexander; Erin Green Comite; Ronen Sarraf; Joseph Gentile as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (AKL)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 18cv3191 SRN/KMM. (AKL)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6498182) filed by Samantha Sohmer, Kathy L. Fellgren. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gustafson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sohmer et al v. UnitedHealth Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc.
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Caitlin L. D. Hull
Represented By: Steven J Wells
Represented By: Meghan L. DesLauriers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Caitlin L. D. Hull
Represented By: Steven J Wells
Represented By: Meghan L. DesLauriers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Caitlin L. D. Hull
Represented By: Steven J Wells
Represented By: Meghan L. DesLauriers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Insurance Company
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Caitlin L. D. Hull
Represented By: Steven J Wells
Represented By: Meghan L. DesLauriers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Caitlin L. D. Hull
Represented By: Steven J Wells
Represented By: Meghan L. DesLauriers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy L. Fellgren
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr
Represented By: Matthew Michael Gerend
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Gretchen S Obrist
Represented By: William Henry Narwold
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: David A Goodwin
Represented By: Garrett Heilman
Represented By: Carey Alexander
Represented By: Mathew P. Jasinski
Represented By: Christopher Michael Barrett
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Brian C Gudmundson
Represented By: Chanele Reyes
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Ron Kilgard
Represented By: Craig Archer Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Sohmer
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr
Represented By: Matthew Michael Gerend
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Gretchen S Obrist
Represented By: William Henry Narwold
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: David A Goodwin
Represented By: Garrett Heilman
Represented By: Carey Alexander
Represented By: Mathew P. Jasinski
Represented By: Christopher Michael Barrett
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Brian C Gudmundson
Represented By: Chanele Reyes
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Ron Kilgard
Represented By: Craig Archer Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?