Delta Industrial Services, Inc. v. Kaman Automation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Delta Industrial Services, Inc.
Defendant: Kaman Automation, Inc. and Kollmorgen Corporation
Case Number: 0:2018cv03203
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Rule 26 Meeting Report, Rule 26 Worksheet, confidential settlement letter due by 2/25/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2019 at 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 1/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (MME)
January 11, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Delta Industrial Services, Inc. Delta's Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) Notice of Dismissal (Hofman, Kevin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Kamans parent corporation is Kaman Industrial Technologies Corporation, which owns 100% of Kamans capital stock. (Lynch, Jason) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (lmb).
January 10, 2019 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General #1 Delta Industrial Services' Complaint filed by Kaman Automation, Inc..(Lynch, Jason)
January 10, 2019 Filing 24 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #21 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Kaman Automation, Inc..(Lynch, Jason)
January 10, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General #1 Delta Industrial Services' Complaint filed by Kaman Automation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) PO 385089, #2 Exhibit(s) Kaman Acknowledgement, #3 Exhibit(s) Kaman Ts & Cs, #4 Exhibit(s) Delta Letter, #5 Addendum Ames Declaration)(Lynch, Jason)
January 10, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General #1 Delta Industrial Services' Complaint : Date and time to be determined. (Lynch, Jason)
January 10, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss/General #1 Delta Industrial Services' Complaint filed by Kaman Automation, Inc.. (Lynch, Jason)
January 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara E Nachtman on behalf of Kollmorgen Corporation. (Nachtman, Sara)
January 10, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Kollmorgen Corporation. (Feriancek, Jerome)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text-only) ORDER on #16 Stipulation. Defendant Kollmorgen Corporation may have until January 10, 2019 to respond to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 12/17/2018. (MME)
December 13, 2018 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 Stipulation. (Feriancek, Jerome)
December 13, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Kollmorgen Corporation. Jointly Signed by Delta Industrial Services, Inc. d/b/a Delta ModTech. (Feriancek, Jerome)
December 13, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome D Feriancek on behalf of Kollmorgen Corporation. (Feriancek, Jerome)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert T Rhoad for Kaman Automation, Inc..; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason Lynch for Kaman Automation, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 12/10/2018. (JGK)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text-only) ORDER on #9 Stipulation. Defendant Kaman Automation, Inc. may have until January 10, 2019 to respond to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 12/10/2018. (MME)
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason C. Lynch. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6528031 filed by Kaman Automation, Inc.. (Knoll, Aaron)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert T. Rhoad. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6527957 filed by Kaman Automation, Inc.. (Knoll, Aaron)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Knoll, Aaron)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Kaman Automation, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Delta Industrial Services, Inc. d/b/a Delta ModTech. (Knoll, Aaron)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron P Knoll on behalf of Kaman Automation, Inc.. (Knoll, Aaron)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron P Knoll on behalf of Kaman Automation, Inc., Kollmorgen Corporation. (Knoll, Aaron) Modified text on 12/3/2018 (MMP).
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Delta Industrial Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued on Kollmorgen Corporation (Hofman, Kevin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Delta Industrial Services, Inc.s Corporate Disclosure Statement: Delta Industrial Services, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of its parent company, Delta ModTech Holdings, LLC. There is no other entity that owns more than 10% of Delta Industrial Services, Inc., filed by Delta Industrial Services, Inc.(Hofman, Kevin) Modified text on 11/28/2018 (MMP).
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Delta Industrial Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued on Kaman Automation, Inc. (Hofman, Kevin)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kaman Automation, Inc., Kollmorgen Corporation. (AKL)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18cv3203 PJS/SER. (AKL)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6500334) filed by Delta Industrial Services, Inc. d/ba/ Delta ModTech. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hofman, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Industrial Services, Inc. v. Kaman Automation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaman Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Robert T Rhoad
Represented By: Jason Lynch
Represented By: Aaron P Knoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kollmorgen Corporation
Represented By: Sara E Nachtman
Represented By: Jerome D Feriancek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Industrial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin D Hofman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?