Terrybear, Inc. v. Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Terrybear, Inc.
Defendant: Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc. and J Messer Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv03228
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sartouk Moussavi for Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc..; granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael Anthony Parks for Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/8/2019. (NAH)
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael A. Parks. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6584309 filed by Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc.. (Dayhoff, Aimee)
January 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sartouk H. Moussavi. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6584288 filed by Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc.. (Dayhoff, Aimee)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc.. (Dayhoff, Aimee)
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint filed by Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc.. (Dayhoff, Aimee)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on #11 Stipulation. J. Messer Enterprises, LLC shall have through February 1, 2019, to file its response to Terrybear, Inc.'s Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/4/2019. (HAM)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Stipulation. (Zeuli, Anthony)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or to Otherwise Plead by Terrybear, Inc.. Jointly Signed by J. Messer Enterprises, LLC. (Zeuli, Anthony)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation. Defendants J. Messer Enterprises, LLC and Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc. shall have through January 4, 2019, to file their response to Terrybear, Inc.'s Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/11/2018. (HAM)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Zeuli, Anthony)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or to Otherwise Plead by Terrybear, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc. and J. Messer Enterprises, LLC. (Zeuli, Anthony)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terrybear, Inc.. J Messer Enterprises LLC served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Zeuli, Anthony)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terrybear, Inc.. Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc. served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Zeuli, Anthony)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Elisabeth Muirhead as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc., J Messer Enterprises LLC. (MMP)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd 4th Copyright & Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 18-cv-3228 (ECT/TNL). (MMP)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Terrybear, Inc.. (Zeuli, Anthony)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc., J Messer Enterprises LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6504327) filed by Terrybear, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N, #15 Exhibit(s) O, #16 Exhibit(s) P, #17 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zeuli, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrybear, Inc. v. Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bass-Mollett Publishers, Inc.
Represented By: Sartouk Moussavi
Represented By: Aimee D Dayhoff
Represented By: Michael Anthony Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Messer Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrybear, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony R Zeuli
Represented By: Elisabeth Muirhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?