Woodward v. Vogelsberg et al
Plaintiff: John Stephen Woodward
Defendant: Mark Krenik, Thomas Ray Jackson, Sam Azure, Robert J. Vogelsberg, Sam Asure and Thomas Jackson
Case Number: 0:2018cv03263
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica E Schwie on behalf of Mark Krenik. (Schwie, Jessica)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/22/2019. (MSK) cc: Robert J. Vogelsberg. Modified text on 1/22/2019 (MMP).
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Robert J. Vogelsberg. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(AKL) Document QC'd on 1/23/2019 (CLK).
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by John Stephen Woodward. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhbit A2, #3 Exhibit A3, #4 Exhibit A4) (Perske, Christopher) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (MMP).
December 12, 2018 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (KLL)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sam Azure, Thomas Jackson, Mark Krenik, Robert J. Vogelsberg. (kt)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 18-cv-3263 WMW/BRT. (kt)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Perske on behalf of John Stephen Woodward. (Perske, Christopher)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6516881) filed by John Stephen Woodward. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Perske, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodward v. Vogelsberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Krenik
Represented By: Jessica E Schwie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ray Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Azure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Vogelsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Asure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stephen Woodward
Represented By: Christopher J Perske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?