Langerman v. Hollingsworth & Vose Company et al
Plaintiff: Donna J Langerman and Donna J. Langerman
Defendant: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company and Hollingsworth & Vose Company
Case Number: 0:2018cv03327
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Michael J Davis
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(VLM)
January 18, 2019 Filing 28 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(JLB)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL #26 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and without costs to either party as to Defendant Hollingsworth & Vose Company. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/18/2019. (GRR)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL #25 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and without costs to either party. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/17/2019. (GRR)
January 15, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hollingsworth & Vose Company. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff. (Thibodeau, Matthew)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company to Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/11/2019. (GRR)
January 11, 2019 Filing 23 Letter re: withdrawal of motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction from Matthew R. Thibodeau. (Thibodeau, Matthew)
January 3, 2019 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Hollingsworth & Vose Company. (Thibodeau, Matthew)
January 3, 2019 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company.(Thibodeau, Matthew)
January 3, 2019 Filing 20 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #16 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company.(Thibodeau, Matthew)
January 3, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Frederick JR. Stehle in SUPPORT OF #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company.(Thibodeau, Matthew)
January 3, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Thibodeau, Matthew)
January 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Date and time to be determined. (Thibodeau, Matthew)
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company. (Thibodeau, Matthew)
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Thibodeau, Matthew)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint filed by R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, as successor by merger to Lorillard Tobacco Company. (Thibodeau, Matthew). Per filer, sealed in error and requested to be unsealed - Modified text on 1/3/2019 (KNK).
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Suzanne M Teeven for R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/27/2018. (JGK)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Erin M. Wood for Donna J. Langerman.; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gibbs C Henderson for Donna J. Langerman. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/27/2018. (JGK)
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Suzanne M. Teeven. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6570291 filed by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (Thibodeau, Matthew)
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R Thibodeau on behalf of All Defendants. (Thibodeau, Matthew)
December 22, 2018 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed for Complaint served on Hollingsworth & Vose Company on 12/13/2018, filed by Donna J. Langerman. (Gott, Ryan)
December 22, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gibbs C. Henderson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6568567 filed by Donna J. Langerman. (Gott, Ryan)
December 22, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erin M. Wood. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6568564 filed by Donna J. Langerman. (Gott, Ryan)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna J. Langerman. R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Gott, Ryan)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Peter Kraus; Gibbs C. Henderson; Erin M. Wood as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (AKL)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hollingsworth & Vose Company, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (AKL)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18cv3327 MJD/LIB. (AKL)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint,. (Gott, Ryan) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (JLB).
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6532244) filed by Donna J Langerman. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Gott, Ryan) Modified on 12/6/2018 (AKL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langerman v. Hollingsworth & Vose Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna J Langerman
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Gott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna J. Langerman
Represented By: Erin M. Wood
Represented By: Michael R Strom
Represented By: Gibbs C Henderson
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Gott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company
Represented By: Matthew R Thibodeau
Represented By: Suzanne M Teeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollingsworth & Vose Company
Represented By: Matthew R Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?