Qin et al v. Avis Budget Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ming Qin and Guo Jun Zhang
Defendant: Avis Budget Group, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv03343
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (KAT)
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Avis Budget Group, Inc.. (Lilleberg, B)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Avis Budget Group, Inc.. (Lilleberg, B)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ming Qin, Guo Jun Zhang. Avis Budget Group, Inc. served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Sheu, Edward)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Avis Budget Group, Inc.. (kt)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 18-cv-3343 ECT/KMM. (kt)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6535087) filed by Ming Qin, Guo Jun Zhang. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sheu, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qin et al v. Avis Budget Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ming Qin
Represented By: Edward Peter Sheu
Represented By: John M Sheran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guo Jun Zhang
Represented By: Edward Peter Sheu
Represented By: John M Sheran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Budget Group, Inc.
Represented By: B Jon Lilleberg
Represented By: Peter Michael Leiferman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?