Castro-Jacques v. Lang-Nelson Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael K. Castro-Jacques
Defendant: Broadway Village Investors, LLC, Lang-Nelson Associates, Inc. and Summit/Broadway Limited Partnership
Case Number: 0:2018cv03376
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Kantor, Joseph)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Broadway Village Investors, LLC, Lang-Nelson Associates, Inc., Summit/Broadway Limited Partnership. (Kantor, Joseph)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael K. Castro-Jacques. Broadway Village Investors, LLC served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Morben, Bryan)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael K. Castro-Jacques. Summit/Broadway Limited Partnership served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Morben, Bryan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D Kantor on behalf of Broadway Village Investors, LLC. (Kantor, Joseph)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D Kantor on behalf of Summit/Broadway Limited Partnership. (Kantor, Joseph)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (JEP)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Broadway Village Investors, LLC, Summit/Broadway Limited Partnership. (AKL)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Broadway Village Investors, LLC, Summit/Broadway Limited Partnership. (Morben, Bryan)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accomomdations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18-cv-3376 (PAM/LIB). (lmb)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lang-Nelson Associates, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Kantor, Joseph)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District for the State of Minnesota, Hennepin County, case number 27-CV-18-18550 (filing fee $400, receipt number BMNDC-6546286) filed by Lang-Nelson Associates, Inc. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit(s) Defendants State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) Summons, #4 Exhibit(s) Complaint, #5 Exhibit(s) Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit(s) Defendants Amended Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, #8 Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Removal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet). (Kantor, Joseph) Modified text on 12/12/2018 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro-Jacques v. Lang-Nelson Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadway Village Investors, LLC
Represented By: Timothy R Maher
Represented By: Joseph D Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lang-Nelson Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy R Maher
Represented By: Joseph D Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit/Broadway Limited Partnership
Represented By: Timothy R Maher
Represented By: Joseph D Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael K. Castro-Jacques
Represented By: Bryan J. Morben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?