Sandipan Chowdhury and Booth Sweet, LLP v. Hansmeier
Appellant: Sandipan Chowdhury and Booth Sweet, LLP
Appellee: Paul Hansmeier
Case Number: 0:2018cv03403
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Paul Hansmeier (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(AKL)
February 2, 2019 Filing 24 Appellant's Corrected BRIEF by Sandipan Chowdhury and Booth Sweet, LLP. (Godfread, Paul) Modified text on 2/4/2019 (kt).
February 1, 2019 Filing 23 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, SEE DOC. NO. #24 Appellant's BRIEF by Sandipan Chowdhury and Booth Sweet, LLP. (Godfread, Paul) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (KNK).
January 31, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE re #21 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Paul Hansmeier.(AKL) Document QC'd on 2/11/2019 (CLK).
January 30, 2019 Filing 21 OBJECTION to #20 Report and Recommendation filed by Sandipan Chowdhury and Booth Sweet, LLP.(JME)
January 30, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Chief United States Bankruptcy Judge Kathleen Sanberg dated 1/14/2019. (JME) cc: Paul Hansmeier. Modified text on 1/31/2019 (MMP).
January 29, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Sandipan Chowdhury and Booth Sweet, LLP . (Godfread, Paul)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. That 19-cv-156 (NEB) has been reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 1/23/2019. (lmb) cc: Hansmeier.
January 24, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) cc: Paul Hansmeier Order along with Practice Pointers. Modified text on 1/25/2019 (MMP).
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Appellants request an extension of time to file their opening brief in this appeal, from January 13, 2019, to February 1, 2019. #12 Appellants contend that good cause exists for such an extension based on Appellants' required preparation for and appearance at a January 9, 2019 show-cause hearing before the bankruptcy judge in this matter and Appellants' pending related appeal in Case No. 18-cv-0761, either of which could impact their appeal in this case. The Court finds that good cause exists for the requested extension of time. See Fed. R. App. P. 26(b). Accordingly, Appellants request is GRANTED, and their opening brief in this appeal shall be filed on or before February 1, 2019. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 1/9/2019. (RJE) cc: Paul Hansmeier. Modified text on 1/9/2019 (MMP).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Stay Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 1/4/2019. (RE) cc: Paul Hansmeier. Modified text on 1/7/2019 (MMP).
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 Reply to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Stay filed by Sandipan Chowdhury and Booth Sweet, LLP. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Godfread, Paul)
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay filed by Paul Hansmeier.(AKL) Document QC'd on 1/11/2019 (JGK).
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright for all further proceedings. Judge Patrick J. Schiltz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-3403 (WMW). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Patrick J. Schiltz on 1/2/2019. cc: Hansmeier.(KNK)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 APPELLANT'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE THEIR OPENING BRIEF W/ ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, by Sandipan Chowdhury and Booth Sweet, LLP. (Godfread, Paul) Modified text on 1/3/2019 (MMP).
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGES by Sandipan Chowdhury and Booth Sweet, LLP . (Godfread, Paul) Modified text on 1/2/2019 (MMP).
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT AND ASSIGNMENT IN RE: BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL. (MMP) cc: Paul Hansmeier. Modified text on 12/28/2018 (MMP).
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(1), the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota gives notice that the record for this appeal is available electronically.(SMD)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 12/13/2018. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2019.(SMD)
December 24, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Stay filed by Sandipan Chowdhury and Booth Sweet, LLP. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Godfread, Paul)
December 24, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay filed by Sandipan Chowdhury and Booth Sweet, LLP. (Godfread, Paul)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Allen Godfread on behalf of Sandipan Chowdhury and Booth Sweet, LLP. (Godfread, Paul)
December 15, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Jason E. Sweet as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
December 15, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd 4th Bankruptcy list. Please use case number 18-cv-3403 (PJS). (MMP)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Bankruptcy Court Case Number 15-42460. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket)(SMD)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of APPEAL from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 15-42460. Adversary Proceeding number 16-4124. filed by Sandipan Chowdhury and Booth Sweet, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice on Appeal, #2 Election to U.S. District Court, #3 Identification of Residence, #4 Order on Appeal) (SMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandipan Chowdhury and Booth Sweet, LLP v. Hansmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sandipan Chowdhury and Booth Sweet, LLP
Represented By: Paul Allen Godfread
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Paul Hansmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?