Recurring Security Finance, LLC v. RMR Capital, LLC
Plaintiff: Recurring Security Finance, LLC
Defendant: RMR Capital, LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv03442
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(AKL)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 2/12/2019. (DLO)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Schoenwetter, C)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Recurring Security Finance, LLC. Jointly Signed by RMR Capital, LLC and Recurring Security Finance, LLC. (Schoenwetter, C)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 1/3/2019. (CLB)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to RMR Capital, LLC. (MMP)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd, 4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 18-cv-3442 (DSD/TNL). (MMP)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RMR Capital, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6562642) filed by Recurring Security Finance, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carrier, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Recurring Security Finance, LLC v. RMR Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Recurring Security Finance, LLC
Represented By: C J Schoenwetter
Represented By: David J Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMR Capital, LLC
Represented By: Richard D Snyder
Represented By: Pamela Abbate-Dattilo
Represented By: John Pavelko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?