Linehan v. Johnston et al
Plaintiff: Dennis D. Linehan
Defendant: Darlene L. Harris, Randy Gordon, Nancy Johnston, Emily Johnson Piper, Andrea L. Rimode, Brian S. Ninneman, Jason J. Defibaugh, Justin L. Joslin, Terry Kneisel and Corinne Hoadley
Case Number: 0:2018cv03483
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Prisoner Complaint filed by Dennis D. Linehan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/20/2019. (KAT) cc: Dennis D. Linehan. Modified text on 2/21/2019 (MMP).
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Mr. Linehan must supplement his application within 20 days. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/24/2019. (KAT) cc: Linehan. Modified text on 1/25/2019 (MMP).
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Dennis D. Linehan.(AKL) Document QC'd on 1/11/2019 (JGK).
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 EXHIBIT re #1 Prisoner Complaint filed by Plaintiff. (AKL) Document QC'd on 1/11/2019 (JGK).
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Dennis D. Linehan. (AKL) Document QC'd on 1/11/2019 (JGK).
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Dennis D. Linehan. (AKL) Document QC'd on 1/11/2019 (JGK).
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason J. Defibaugh, Randy Gordon, Darlene L. Harris, Corinne Hoadley, Nancy Johnston, Justin L. Joslin, Terry Kneisel, Brian S. Ninneman, Emily Johnson Piper, Andrea L. Rimode filed by Dennis D. Linehan. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (cc: Linehan) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope 1, #3 Envelope 2, #4 Envelope 3) (AKL) Document QC'd on 1/11/2019 (JGK). Modified text on 2/7/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linehan v. Johnston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene L. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Johnson Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea L. Rimode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian S. Ninneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason J. Defibaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin L. Joslin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Kneisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corinne Hoadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis D. Linehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?