Richardson v. Gerlach
Plaintiff: Ebonie Richardson
Defendant: Chuck Gerlach
Case Number: 0:2018cv03499
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: David S Doty
2 Judge: Tony N Leung
3 Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #1 Prisoner Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/14/2019. (TJB) cc: Ebonie Richardson. (kt)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge David S. Doty and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz for all further proceedings. Judge Nancy E. Brasel, Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-3499 DSD/DTS. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 2/1/2019. (MMG) cc:Ebonie Richardson.
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #3 MOTION for Immediate Release from MCF-Shakopee of MN filed by Ebonie Richardson.(lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/2/2019 (KMH).
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Immediate Release from MCF-Shakopee of MN filed by Ebonie Richardson.(lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/2/2019 (KMH).
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Immediate Release from MCF-Shakopee of MN filed by Ebonie Richardson. (lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/2/2019 (KMH).
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ebonie Richardson. (lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/2/2019 (KMH).
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Chuck Gerlach filed by Ebonie Richardson. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lmb) cc: Plaintiff. Document QC'd by KMH on 1/2/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Gerlach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Gerlach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebonie Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?