El Bey v. Dakota County Sheriff's Office et al

Petitioner: Juanel Anthony Mikulak El Bey
Respondent: Tim Leslie, Dakota County Sheriff's Office and Dakota Co. Jail
Case Number: 0:2019cv00034
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dakota Co. Jail, Dakota County Sheriff's Office, Tim Leslie re #9 Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation (Pipenhagen, Heather)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendation . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Pipenhagen, Heather)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak El Bey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak El Bey filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak El Bey, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak El Bey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/19/2019. (TMA) cc: Juanel Anthony Mikulak El Bey. Modified text on 2/19/2019 (lmb).
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dakota Co. Jail, Dakota County Sheriff's Office, Tim Leslie re #5 Notice of Appearance (Pipenhagen, Heather)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Dawn Pipenhagen on behalf of All Defendants. (Pipenhagen, Heather)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Dakota Co. Jail, Dakota County Sheriff's Office, Tim Leslie Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Juanel Anthony Mikulak El Bey re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak El Bey, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/17/2019 (KMH).
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak El Bey. (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/17/2019 (KMH).
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak El Bey. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd, 4th Civil Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (MMP) cc: Jaunel Anthony Mikulak El Bey. Document QC'd by KMH on 1/17/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El Bey v. Dakota County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tim Leslie
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Heather Dawn Pipenhagen
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dakota County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dakota Co. Jail
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juanel Anthony Mikulak El Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?