Rapatt v. Whiteford

Petitioner: Richard Willmar Rapatt
Respondent: Glenn Whiteford
Case Number: 0:2019cv00042
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
0 Judge: David T Schultz
1 Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Willmar Rapatt re #9 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #10 Declaration. (JLB)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Richart Willmar Rapatt re #9 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Richard Willmar Rapatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) part 1, #2 Exhibit(s) part 2, #3 Exhibit(s) part 3, #4 Exhibit(s) part 4, #5 Exhibit(s) part 5, #6 Exhibit(s) part 6, #7 Exhibit(s) part 7)(JLB)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Richard Willmar Rapatt. (JLB)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail not re-sent to Richard Willmar Rapatt(JLB) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/20/19 (KMH).
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/31/2019. (TJB) (cc: Rapatt) Modified text on 2/1/2019 (AKL).
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Objection and Motion, with attached Certificate of Service and Declaration, filed by Richard Willmar Rapatt (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JLB) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/29/2019 (KMH).
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 ERRATA by Richard Willmar Rapatt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/24/2019 (KMH).
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M Eldien on behalf of Glenn Whiteford. (Eldien, Michelle)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Glenn Whiteford Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Richard Willmar Rapatt re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Richard Willmar Rapatt. (lmb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2019: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Otter Tail County Court Documents) (lmb). Document QC'd by KMH on 1/16/2019 (KMH).
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 44641101584) filed by Richard Willmar Rapatt. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (6th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lmb) cc: Rapatt. Document QC'd by KMH on 1/16/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rapatt v. Whiteford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Glenn Whiteford
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Michelle M Eldien
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Willmar Rapatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?