Howard v. State of Minnesota

Petitioner: Rico P. Howard
Respondent: State of Minnesota
Case Number: 0:2019cv00059
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #13 Letter: Scanned in envelope (KMH)
February 22, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER from Plaintiff to the Court. (AKL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2019: #1 Scanned in envelope) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 2/28/2019 (KMH).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER in Response to #11 Request for Extension of Time. The deadline by which Petitioner must file a reply to Respondent's answer is extended to April 14, 2019. Thereafter, no further submissions from either party will be permitted, except as expressly authorized by Court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/21/2019. cc: Howard (JMK) Modified text on 2/22/2019 (CLK).
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for Extension of Time to Respond to #6 Memorandum, filed by Rico P. Howard. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(lmb)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Minnesota re #9 Redacted Document, #5 Response to Habeas Petition, #6 Memorandum, #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #8 Exhibit (Lawonn, Brittany)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 Redacted Document for #5 , #8 Sealed Appendix . (Lawonn, Brittany)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED EXHIBIT Appendix re #5 Response to Habeas Petition by State of Minnesota. (Lawonn, Brittany)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by State of Minnesota. (Lawonn, Brittany)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM re #5 Response to Habeas Petition filed by State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lawonn, Brittany)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by State of Minnesota. (Lawonn, Brittany)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany D Lawonn on behalf of State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lawonn, Brittany)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by State of Minnesota Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER: Respondent is directed to file an answer to the petition, showing cause why the writ should not be granted. See the order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/14/2019. (JMK) cc: Howard. (kt)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 44641101598) filed by Rico P. Howard. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Affidavits, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Cover Letter with receipt, #4 Envelope, #5 Envelope) (lmb) cc: Petitioner. Document QC'd by KMH on 1/16/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rico P. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Brittany D Lawonn
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Represented By: Jean E Burdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?