Selective Insurance Company of America v. Community Living Options Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Selective Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Erin M. Lundblad, Community Living Options Inc. and Alexis A. O'Brien
Case Number: 0:2019cv00082
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Counterclaim of Community Living Options filed by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Baudry, Alain)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Community Living Options Inc.. (Bye, Jonathan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Erin M. Lundblad, Alexis A. O'Brien. (Lillie, John) Modified text on 2/19/2019 (lmb).
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Selective is a wholly owned subsidiary of Selective Insurance Group, Inc., a publicly traded company (NASDAQ: SIGI). There are no investors or corporations that own more than a 10% interest of Selective Insurance Group, Inc. (Baudry, Alain) Modified text on 2/19/2019 (lmb).
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Alain M. Baudry re #1 Complaint, bySelective Insurance Company of America. (Baudry, Alain)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Selective Insurance Company of America. filed by Community Living Options Inc.. (Bye, Jonathan)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Amy Van Horne for Selective Insurance Company of America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/5/2019. (JGK)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amy L. Van Horne. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6646976 filed by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Baudry, Alain)
January 14, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Community Living Options Inc., Erin M. Lundblad, Alexis A. O'Brien. (lmb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-82 (WMW/BRT). (lmb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Community Living Options Inc., Erin M. Lundblad, Alexis A. O'Brien (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6601169) filed by Selective Insurance Company of America. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baudry, Alain) Modified text on 1/11/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selective Insurance Company of America v. Community Living Options Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selective Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Alain M Baudry
Represented By: Matthew R. Veenstra
Represented By: Amy Van Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin M. Lundblad
Represented By: John C Lillie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Living Options Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan M Bye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis A. O'Brien
Represented By: John C Lillie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?