Wosmek et al v. Schmidt et al

Plaintiff: John Schmidt, Katherine Rippentrop and Jody Wosmek
Defendant: Stanley Schmidt, Steven Schmidt, Jane L. Schmidt Revocable Trust and Trust for John D. Schmidt
Case Number: 0:2019cv00086
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
0 Judge: Katherine M Menendez
1 Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/7/2019. (KAT)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER/NOTICE: Settlement Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Confidential Letter to Court due by 7/18/2019. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/7/2019. (KAT)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2019. Fact Discovery due by 9/1/2019. Expert Discovery due by 11/29/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 10/30/2019. Motions (disp) due by 1/29/2020. Ready for trial due by 5/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/4/2019. (KAT)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/4/2019. Scheduling order to be issued. (KAT)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 (Text-only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS. Request by all counsel to appear by telephone has been GRANTED for the Pretrial Conference on 3/4/2019 at 9:00 AM. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. (KAT)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Katherine Rippentrop(in her capacity as Trustee of the Disclaimer Trust, a subtrust created in the Trust Agreement of Jane L. Schmidt, under agreement dated May 21, 1998, as amended by instruments dated May 7 and May 8, 2008), Katherine Rippentrop(each individually), Katherine Rippentrop(in her capacity as Trustee of Jane & Stanley Schmidt 1997 Irrevocable Trust), Katherine Rippentrop(in her capacity as Trustee of Schmidt Family 1998 Irrevocable Trust), John Schmidt, Jody Wosmek.(Conway, James)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/27/2019. (KAT)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/26/2019. (KAT) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (lmb).
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation,,. (Sitek, Steven)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Jane L. Schmidt Revocable Trust, Stanley Schmidt(personally), Stanley Schmidt(in his capacity as trustee of the same), Steven Schmidt, Trust for John D. Schmidt. Jointly Signed by Jody Wosmek, John Schmidt, Katherine Rippentrop, Katherin Rippentrop in her capacity as Trustee of Schmidt Family 1998 Irrevocable Trust, and Katherine Rippentrop in her capacity as Trustee of the Disclaimer Trust, a subtrust created in the Trust Agreement of Jane L. Schmidt, under agreement dated May 21, 1998, as amended by instruments dated May 7 and May 8, 2008. (Sitek, Steven)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 First Amended REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Katherine Rippentrop. (Conway, James)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Katherine Rippentrop. (Conway, James)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (KAT)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Katherine Rippentrop(in her capacity as Trustee of the Disclaimer Trust, a subtrust created in the Trust Agreement of Jane L. Schmidt, under agreement dated May 21, 1998, as amended by instruments dated May 7 and May 8, 2008). filed by Trust for John D. Schmidt, Stanley Schmidt(personally), Stanley Schmidt(in his capacity as trustee of the same), Steven Schmidt. (Silver, Alan)
January 14, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jane L. Schmidt Revocable Trust, Stanley Schmidt(personally), Stanley Schmidt(in his capacity as trustee of the same), Steven Schmidt, Trust for John D. Schmidt re #1 Notice of Removal, (Silver, Alan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-86 (WMW/KMM). (lmb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesota, First Judicial District, County of Dakota (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6602100) filed by Stanley Schmidt, Steven Schmidt, Jane L. Schmidt Revocable Trust, Trust for John D. Schmidt. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Silver, Alan) Modified text on 1/11/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wosmek et al v. Schmidt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Schmidt
Represented By: Alan I Silver
Represented By: Steven M Sitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Schmidt
Represented By: Alan I Silver
Represented By: Steven M Sitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane L. Schmidt Revocable Trust
Represented By: Alan I Silver
Represented By: Steven M Sitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for John D. Schmidt
Represented By: Alan I Silver
Represented By: Steven M Sitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Schmidt
Represented By: James P Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Rippentrop
Represented By: James P Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Wosmek
Represented By: James P Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?