Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Double D Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Dale Morris Music, Concord Music Group, Inc., R-Key Darkus Publishing, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Sony/ATV Songs LLC d/b/a Sony/ATV Tree Publishing, Sony/ATV Songs LLC db/a Sony ATV Acuff Rose Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Roys Boys LLC and Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Defendant: Double D Partners, LLC, Devin Charles Gasswint and Amy Marie Gasswint
Case Number: 0:2019cv00090
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Double D Partners, LLC, Amy Marie Gasswint, Devin Charles Gasswint. (MMP)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Dale Morris Music, House of Cash, Inc., Orbi-Lee Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Roys Boys LLC, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes re #11 Declaration, #12 Declaration, #10 Application for Entry of Default (Schultz, William)
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Abigail Krueger re #10 Application for Entry of Default by Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Dale Morris Music, House of Cash, Inc., Orbi-Lee Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Roys Boys LLC, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes . (Schultz, William)
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of William Schultz re #10 Application for Entry of Default by Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Dale Morris Music, House of Cash, Inc., Orbi-Lee Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Roys Boys LLC, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes . (Schultz, William)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT . (Schultz, William)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.). (Schultz, William)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.). (Schultz, William)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale Morris Music, Tokeco Tunes, House of Cash, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Songs of Universal, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., R-Key Darkus Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Roys Boys LLC, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.. Devin Charles Gasswint served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Schultz, William)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale Morris Music, Tokeco Tunes, House of Cash, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Songs of Universal, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., R-Key Darkus Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Roys Boys LLC, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.. Amy Marie Gasswint served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Schultz, William)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale Morris Music, Tokeco Tunes, House of Cash, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Songs of Universal, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., R-Key Darkus Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Roys Boys LLC, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.. Double D Partners, LLC served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Schultz, William)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Double D Partners, LLC, Amy Marie Gasswint, Devin Charles Gasswint. (lmb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-90 (SRN/SER). (lmb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. TENGA, Inc is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Plaintiffs Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Dale Morris Music, House of Cash, Inc., Orbi-Lee Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Roys Boys LLC, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC d/b/a Sony/ATV Tree Publishing, Sony/ATV Songs LLC db/a Sony ATV Acuff Rose Music, Tokeco Tunes. (Schultz, William)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Double D Partners, LLC, Amy Marie Gasswint, Devin Charles Gasswint (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6602871) filed by Dale Morris Music, Tokeco Tunes, House of Cash, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Songs of Universal, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., R-Key Darkus Publishing, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Roys Boys LLC, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schultz, William) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Double D Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: William D Schultz
Represented By: Emily M Wessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.
Represented By: William D Schultz
Represented By: Emily M Wessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokeco Tunes
Represented By: William D Schultz
Represented By: Emily M Wessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Morris Music
Represented By: William D Schultz
Represented By: Emily M Wessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Music Group, Inc.
Represented By: William D Schultz
Represented By: Emily M Wessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R-Key Darkus Publishing
Represented By: William D Schultz
Represented By: Emily M Wessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orbi-Lee Publishing
Represented By: William D Schultz
Represented By: Emily M Wessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC d/b/a Sony/ATV Tree Publishing
Represented By: William D Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC db/a Sony ATV Acuff Rose Music
Represented By: William D Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: William D Schultz
Represented By: Emily M Wessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Cash, Inc.
Represented By: William D Schultz
Represented By: Emily M Wessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roys Boys LLC
Represented By: William D Schultz
Represented By: Emily M Wessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Emily M Wessels
Represented By: William D Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double D Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Charles Gasswint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Marie Gasswint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?