Spencer v. Marques

Petitioner: Antwoyn T. Spencer
Respondent: R. Marques
Case Number: 0:2019cv00094
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R. Marques re #6 Response, #7 Declaration (Tweeten, Andrew)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Shannon Boldt re #6 Response by R. Marques . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-B)(Tweeten, Andrew)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by R. Marques.(Tweeten, Andrew)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. Responses due by 3/7/2019. Replies due by 4/7/2019. See order for further instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 2/7/2019. (MME) cc:Antwoyn T. Spencer. Modified text on 2/8/2019 (MMG).
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 RECEIPT number 44641101306 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Antwoyn Spencer. (lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/29/2019 (KMH).
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Tweeten on behalf of R. Marques. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tweeten, Andrew)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COPY OF ORDER GRANTING AUTHORIZATION TO OPEN NEW PROCEEDING. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/9/2019. Order originally filed in 18-mc-1063 (JRT). (lmb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Antwoyn T. Spencer. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (5th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (lmb) cc: Spencer. QC'd on 1/24/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Marques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antwoyn T. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Marques
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?