United States of America v. $30, 839 in U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $30, 839 in U.S. Currency and $30,839 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 0:2019cv00120
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
0 Judge: David S Doty
1 Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of PUBLICATION by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Baune, Craig)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $30,839.00. (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/29/2019 (KMH).
January 18, 2019 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (kt)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 1/18/2019. (CLB)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-120 DSD/SER. (MMG)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $30, 839 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baune, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $30, 839 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $30, 839 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $30,839 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?