Tellagemini Communication LLC v. Nextera Communications, LLC

Plaintiff: Tellagemini Communication LLC
Defendant: Nextera Communications, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv00136
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on #13 Stipulation. Defendant has until 4/12/2019, to answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/6/2019. (VLM)
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 Stipulation. (Recher, Bruce)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Nextera Communications, LLC. Jointly Signed by Tellagemini Communication LLC,. (Recher, Bruce)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tellagemini Communication LLC. Nextera Communications, LLC served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Merrill, Courtland)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-Return of Service Executed for Summons served on Nextera Communications, LLC on 02/19/2019, filed by Tellagemini Communication LLC. (Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (AKL).
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kenneth Andrew Matuszewski for Tellagemini Communication LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/5/2019. (NAH)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Isaac Rabicoff for Tellagemini Communication LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/25/2019. (NAH)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Isaac Rabicoff. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6623547 filed by Tellagemini Communication LLC. (Merrill, Courtland)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kenneth Matuszewski. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6623521 filed by Tellagemini Communication LLC. (Merrill, Courtland)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nextera Communications, LLC. (JLB)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (5th - Patent) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-136 ECT/LIB. (JLB)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Isaac P. Rabicoff, Kenneth Matuszewski as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (JLB)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Tellagemini Communication LLC. (Merrill, Courtland)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Merrill, Courtland)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded) against Nextera Communications, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6614407) filed by Tellagemini Communication LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Merrill, Courtland)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tellagemini Communication LLC v. Nextera Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tellagemini Communication LLC
Represented By: Courtland C Merrill
Represented By: Isaac Rabicoff
Represented By: Kenneth Andrew Matuszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nextera Communications, LLC
Represented By: Bruce C Recher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?